TX HCR109 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Sue Brannon of Midland for her years of civic engagement.
Title
Honoring Sue Brannon of Midland for her years of civic engagement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-04-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-16 | House | Filed |