TX HCR1 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State Insurance Building Annex in the Capitol Complex the John G. Tower State Office Building.
Title
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State Insurance Building Annex in the Capitol Complex the John G. Tower State Office Building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - HCR 1Third Reading House (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-29 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |