TX HB981 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying of handguns by and an exemption from application of the Private Security Act of certain persons who provide security services on a volunteer basis at an established place of religious worship.
Title
Relating to the carrying of handguns by and an exemption from application of the Private Security Act of certain persons who provide security services on a volunteer basis at an established place of religious worship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
Religion
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
Religion
Weapons