TX HB966 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consideration of pension and other postemployment benefits in establishing the rates of a gas utility.
Title
Relating to the consideration of pension and other postemployment benefits in establishing the rates of a gas utility.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-12 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Subjects
ACCOUNTING & ACCOUNTANTS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas