TX HB905 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of knives by a municipality or county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of knives by a municipality or county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - House - HB 905Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenatePassed
2015-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2015-05-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-05-11SenateRead first time
2015-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseRecord vote
2015-05-05HousePassed
2015-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-05HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2015-02-26HouseRead first time
2015-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback