TX HB876 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Summary
Relating to the installation of natural gas pipelines in controlled access highway rights-of-way.
Title
Relating to the installation of natural gas pipelines in controlled access highway rights-of-way.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Orr [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB686 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor