TX HB866 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the installation, removal, and replacement of certain gas pipelines; clarifying changes to related administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the installation, removal, and replacement of certain gas pipelines; clarifying changes to related administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective immediately
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-03HouseAmended 1-Springer
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Energy Resources
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback