TX HB830 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to law enforcement policies regarding the issuance of citations for misdemeanors punishable by fine only and to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain fine-only misdemeanors.
Title
Relating to law enforcement policies regarding the issuance of citations for misdemeanors punishable by fine only and to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain fine-only misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#592 (Y: 113 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#592 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB950 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1626 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1626 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY