TX SB950 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to law enforcement policies regarding the issuance of citations for misdemeanors punishable by fine only and to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain fine-only misdemeanors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to law enforcement policies regarding the issuance of citations for misdemeanors punishable by fine only and to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain fine-only misdemeanors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB830 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1626 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback