TX HB818 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to indemnification provisions in construction contracts.
Title
Relating to indemnification provisions in construction contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB555 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Insurance
Insurance--General
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Insurance
Insurance--General
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation