TX HB746 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to installment payments of ad valorem taxes imposed on residence homesteads in certain counties.
Title
Relating to installment payments of ad valorem taxes imposed on residence homesteads in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions