TX HB725 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain children who are or were in foster care for free prekindergarten programs in public schools.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain children who are or were in foster care for free prekindergarten programs in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#84 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#84 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Record vote RV#84 |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-03-31 | House | Amended 1-Patterson |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
JACE'S LAW
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
JACE'S LAW
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN