TX HB638 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to annuity payments to surviving spouses and designated beneficiaries of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Title
Relating to annuity payments to surviving spouses and designated beneficiaries of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - HB 638Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-06 | House | Amended |
2015-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-09 | House | Filed |