TX HB633 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Postponed 8/17/24 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Postponed 8/17/24 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the method of payment for certain health care provided by a hospital.
Title
Relating to the method of payment for certain health care provided by a hospital.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Postponed 8/17/24 10:00 AM |
2023-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 40 and Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Frank |
2023-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 40 |
2023-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 18(a) |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-20 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |