TX HB578 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain leave policies for state employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain leave policies for state employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#523 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2016-12-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback