TX HB56 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the operation of concrete plants and crushing facilities at certain locations.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the operation of concrete plants and crushing facilities at certain locations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB953 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB3604 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
HB3604 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB56 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00056I.htm |