TX HB53 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of April as Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of April as Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Administration
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback