TX HB492 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#792 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#776 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateAmended
2021-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 West
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-21SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#792
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#776
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-05HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Crockett
2021-05-05HouseAmended 1-Wu
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB175 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1272 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2009 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB4464 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB492
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00492I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00492H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00492E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00492S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00492H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00492H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00492S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00492I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00492H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00492H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00492E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00492E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00492S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00492S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB492&RcdVtNo=776&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB492&RcdVtNo=792&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=143
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=144
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=47

Bill Comments

feedback