TX HB4464 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB175 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB492 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Received from the House
HB1272 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2009 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback