TX HB4835 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of certain health care provider participation programs.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of certain health care provider participation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#802 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#802 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-11 | See remarks for effective date | |
2023-06-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#802 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
JEFFERSON COUNTY
MEDICAID
NECHES RIVER
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
JEFFERSON COUNTY
MEDICAID
NECHES RIVER
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital