TX HB48 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a database of employers penalized for failure to pay wages or convicted of certain offenses involving wage theft.
Title
Relating to a database of employers penalized for failure to pay wages or convicted of certain offenses involving wage theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#298 (Y: 95 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Amended RV#271 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Amended RV#271 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#298 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#271 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended 1-Patterson |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--Wages
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--Wages
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS