TX HB4736 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the annual salary paid to judges of county courts at law in Travis County.
Title
Relating to the annual salary paid to judges of county courts at law in Travis County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2499 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4736 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04736I.htm |