TX HB4676 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Summary
Relating to registration and license plate fees for motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to registration and license plate fees for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1636 (Same As) 2009-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration