TX HB4643 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the comptroller to implement a pilot program that establishes a pension revenue enhancement plan for the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to a study by the comptroller to implement a pilot program that establishes a pension revenue enhancement plan for the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - Permission to introduce RV#292 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-16 | House | Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#292 |
2021-04-16 | House | Permission to introduce |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees