TX HB4642 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to offenses involving the manufacture or delivery of certain controlled substances and the enforcement and prevention of those offenses; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to offenses involving the manufacture or delivery of certain controlled substances and the enforcement and prevention of those offenses; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1308 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
FENTANYL OFFENSES ENFORCEMENT TASK FORCE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LETHAL POISONING PRVENTION TASK FORCE
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
FENTANYL OFFENSES ENFORCEMENT TASK FORCE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LETHAL POISONING PRVENTION TASK FORCE
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed