TX HB463 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ineligibility to serve as a poll watcher.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ineligibility to serve as a poll watcher.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HousePostponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-04HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Elections
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback