TX HB4595 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Montgomery County Water Control and Improvement District No. 205; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Montgomery County Water Control and Improvement District No. 205; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2182 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2182 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2182 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2182 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MONTGOMERY COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 205
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
MONTGOMERY COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 205
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.