TX HB4584 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Meeting cancelled
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Meeting cancelled
Summary
Relating to improving efficiency in state government and reducing state government spending.
Title
Relating to improving efficiency in state government and reducing state government spending.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control