TX HB4573 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of municipal annexation of territory in the City of Conroe Municipal Management District No. 3.
Title
Relating to the effect of municipal annexation of territory in the City of Conroe Municipal Management District No. 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1784 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
CITY OF CONROE MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 3
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous