TX HB457 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a county of a portion of the value of the residence homestead of a physician who provides health care services for which the physician agrees not to seek payment from any source, including the Medicaid program or otherwise from this state or the federal government, to county residents who are indigent or who are Medicaid recipients.
Title
Relating to a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a county of a portion of the value of the residence homestead of a physician who provides health care services for which the physician agrees not to seek payment from any source, including the Medicaid program or otherwise from this state or the federal government, to county residents who are indigent or who are Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#231 (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#231 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR25 (Enabling for) 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Indigent Health Care
MEDICAID
PHYSICIANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Health Care Providers
Health--Indigent Health Care
MEDICAID
PHYSICIANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions