TX HJR25 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a county of a portion of the value of the residence homestead of a physician who provides health care services for which the physician agrees not to seek payment from any source, including the Medicaid program or otherwise from this state or the federal government, to county residents who are indigent or who are Medicaid recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a county of a portion of the value of the residence homestead of a physician who provides health care services for which the physician agrees not to seek payment from any source, including the Medicaid program or otherwise from this state or the federal government, to county residents who are indigent or who are Medicaid recipients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - Adopted RV#209 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#209
2021-04-14HouseAdopted
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB457 (Enabled by) 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback