TX HB4414 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to identification and development of mental health resources for students.
Title
Relating to identification and development of mental health resources for students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1563 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4414 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04414I.htm |