TX HB4368 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to participation in, contributions to, and the benefits and administration of retirement systems for police officers in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to participation in, contributions to, and the benefits and administration of retirement systems for police officers in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1669 (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1669 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Rodriguez |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal