TX HB4259 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of information regarding suicide prevention and certain state laws applicable to handgun license holders.
Title
Relating to the provision of information regarding suicide prevention and certain state laws applicable to handgun license holders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |