TX HB4247 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the use of the proceeds of cash deposits filed with the Railroad Commission of Texas by certain persons under the jurisdiction of the commission and deposited in the oil-field cleanup fund.
Title
Relating to the use of the proceeds of cash deposits filed with the Railroad Commission of Texas by certain persons under the jurisdiction of the commission and deposited in the oil-field cleanup fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-02 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |