TX HB4117 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Posting rule suspended
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Posting rule suspended
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of telemental health services to prisoners confined in county jails, including the creation of the county jail telemental health fund, and to certain rules and procedures relating to the safety of those prisoners.
Title
Relating to the provision of telemental health services to prisoners confined in county jails, including the creation of the county jail telemental health fund, and to certain rules and procedures relating to the safety of those prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1084 (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-05 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TELEMEDICINE
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TELEMEDICINE