TX HB4101 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a governmental entity to limit bidding on certain public contracts to bidders that are small businesses.
Title
Relating to the authority of a governmental entity to limit bidding on certain public contracts to bidders that are small businesses.
Sponsors
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] |
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
County Government
County Government--Finance
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
County Government
County Government--Finance
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local