TX HB4051 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the method of payment for certain health care and certain contract provisions affecting health care reimbursement rates.
Title
Relating to the method of payment for certain health care and certain contract provisions affecting health care reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |