TX HB3969 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study regarding the feasibility of implementing a central filing system for the filing of financing statements for agricultural liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study regarding the feasibility of implementing a central filing system for the filing of financing statements for agricultural liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#960 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback