TX HB3912 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the East Downtown Management District to impose a tax, fee, or assessment on a residential property.
Title
Relating to authorizing the East Downtown Management District to impose a tax, fee, or assessment on a residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-03 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EAST DOWNTOWN MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3912 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03912I.htm |