TX HB3815 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the suspension of a person's driver's license or permit on conviction of a fifth offense relating to the operating of a motor vehicle while intoxicated.
Title
Relating to the suspension of a person's driver's license or permit on conviction of a fifth offense relating to the operating of a motor vehicle while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - HB 3815Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID