TX HB3775 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to severance pay for political subdivision employees and independent contractors.
Title
Relating to severance pay for political subdivision employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Political Subdivisions
Salaries & Expenses
City Government--Employees/Officers
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Political Subdivisions
Salaries & Expenses