TX HB3760 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care, regulation of abortion, and the availability of certain defenses to prosecution for homicide and assault offenses; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care, regulation of abortion, and the availability of certain defenses to prosecution for homicide and assault offenses; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1647 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Abortion
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
DISCRIMINATION
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
DISCRIMINATION
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT