TX SB1647 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care, regulation of abortion, and the availability of certain defenses to prosecution for homicide and assault offenses; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care, regulation of abortion, and the availability of certain defenses to prosecution for homicide and assault offenses; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FA2 Hughes (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-31HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-30SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenatePassed
2021-03-30SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateAmended
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
2021-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-29SenateAmended
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3760 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1647
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01647I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01647S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01647E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01647H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01647S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01647S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01647I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01647I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01647S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01647S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01647E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01647H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01647H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-30-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-30-F.PDF#page=12

Bill Comments 750

feedback