TX HB3708 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures regarding high school completion and enrollment in higher education.
Title
Relating to measures regarding high school completion and enrollment in higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SCHOLARSHIPS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SCHOLARSHIPS