TX HB3680 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to creating the offense of contributing to the delinquency of a child.
Title
Relating to creating the offense of contributing to the delinquency of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-30 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-30 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against