TX HB3650 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of functions relating to the economic regulation of water and sewer service from the Public Utility Commission of Texas to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the transfer of functions relating to the economic regulation of water and sewer service from the Public Utility Commission of Texas to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer