TX HB3647 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Monument and Ceremony.
Title
Relating to the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Monument and Ceremony.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1775 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |