TX HB3626 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of eligible central municipality for purposes of the municipal hotel occupancy tax.
Title
Relating to the definition of eligible central municipality for purposes of the municipal hotel occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government--Finance
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3626 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03626I.htm |