TX HB3562 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of a policy allowing a grace period after the exhaustion of the balance of a meal card or account used by students to purchase meals in public schools.
Title
Relating to the adoption of a policy allowing a grace period after the exhaustion of the balance of a meal card or account used by students to purchase meals in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - HB 3562Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 3562Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 3562Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NUTRITION
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NUTRITION